Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB3
Introduced on: Jun 07, 2005
By: Committee of the Whole
Makes various changes relating to energy, conservation, construction and renovation and creates incentives and standards for green buildings. (BDR 22-0012)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
 
Upcoming Hearings
 
Past Hearings
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-07   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-07   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Jun 07, 2005

  • Read first time.
  • To printer.
  • From printer.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
    • Section 38 of this act effective June 1, 2005. Sections 14 to 37, inclusive, 39, 40, 41 and 42 of this act effective June 17, 2005. Sections 1, 2, 4, 6, 7, 8 and 9 to 13, inclusive, of this act effective: (a) June 17, 2005, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) On October 1, 2005, for all other purposes. Section 5 of this act effective on October 1, 2005, and applies to the construction or renovation of a public building, the designing of which begins on or after that date. Sections 8.1 to 8.8, inclusive, of this act effective: (a) June 17, 2005, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) On July 1, 2006, for all other purposes. Section 3 of this act effective July 1, 2007, and applies to the construction of a public building, the designing of which begins on or after that date. Sections 8.55 and 8.6 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational or recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo