Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB239
Introduced on Feb 23, 2001
By Human Resources and Facilities
Makes various changes concerning provision of prescription drugs and pharmaceutical services for senior citizens. (BDR 40-1318)
Fiscal Note
   Effect On Local Government: No.
   Effect on the State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full bill history below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed).

Hearings
Senate Human Resources and Facilities Mar-12-2001 Do pass
Assembly Health and Human Services May-07-2001 No Action
 
Votes
Senate Final Passage  Mar-15   21 Yea , 0 Nay , 0 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
 
Bill Text (PDF) As Introduced                                
Bill Text (HTML) As Introduced                                
Amendments (HTML)

 Bill History

Feb 23, 2001

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Facilities. To printer.
  • Feb 26, 2001

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Mar 13, 2001

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Mar 14, 2001

  • Read second time.
  • Mar 15, 2001

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None). To Assembly.
  • Mar 16, 2001

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
  • May 22, 2001

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed).

  • Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo