Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB347
Introduced on Mar 14, 2001
By Titus, James, O'Donnell
Designates state tartan. (BDR 19-749)
Fiscal Note
   Effect On Local Government: No.
   Effect on the State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full bill history below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 43.

Hearings
Senate Government Affairs Mar-23-2001 No Action
Senate Government Affairs Mar-28-2001 Do pass
Assembly Government Affairs Apr-26-2001 Do pass
 
Votes
Senate Final Passage  Apr-06   19 Yea , 0 Nay , 2 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
Assembly Final Passage  May-02   42 Yea , 0 Nay , 0 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
 
Bill Text (PDF) As Introduced                             As Enrolled    
Bill Text (HTML) As Introduced                             As Enrolled    
Amendments (HTML)

 Bill History

Mar 14, 2001

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
  • Mar 15, 2001

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Apr 04, 2001

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Apr 05, 2001

  • Read second time.
  • Apr 06, 2001

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2). To Assembly.
  • Apr 09, 2001

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
  • Apr 30, 2001

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • May 01, 2001

  • Read second time.
  • May 02, 2001

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None). To Senate.
  • May 03, 2001

  • In Senate. To enrollment.
  • May 04, 2001

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • May 08, 2001

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 43.

  • Effective May 8, 2001.
    Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo