Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB466
Introduced on Mar 19, 2001
By Leslie, Parks, Parnell, Gibbons, Anderson, Brower, Chowning, Freeman, Giunchigliani, Humke, Smith, Tiffany, Mathews
Enacts provisions governing licensing and operation of interactive gaming and revises various provisions relating to gaming. (BDR 41-244)
Fiscal Note
   Effect On Local Government: Yes.
   Effect on the State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full bill history below)
Chapter 593.

Hearings
Assembly Judiciary Apr-11-2001 No Action
Assembly Judiciary Apr-16-2001 Amend, and do pass as amended
Senate Judiciary May-17-2001 No Action
Senate Judiciary May-21-2001 Amend, and do pass as amended
Senate Judiciary May-31-2001 Do not recede
 
Votes
2/3 Majority
Required  
Assembly Final Passage  Apr-25   37 Yea , 3 Nay , 1 Excused , 1 Not Voting , 0 Absent
2/3 Majority
Required  
Senate Final Passage  May-26   19 Yea , 0 Nay , 2 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
 
Bill Text (PDF) As Introduced     1st Reprint         Second Reprint     Third Reprint             As Enrolled    
Bill Text (HTML) As Introduced     1st Reprint         Second Reprint     Third Reprint             As Enrolled    
Amendments (HTML) Amend. No.500 Amend. No.910 Amend. No.CA17

 Bill History

Mar 19, 2001

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  • Mar 20, 2001

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Apr 24, 2001

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 500). To printer.
  • Apr 25, 2001

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 3, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1). To Senate.
  • Apr 26, 2001

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
  • May 24, 2001

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • May 25, 2001

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 910). To printer.
  • May 26, 2001

  • From printer. To re-engrossment.
  • Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2). To Assembly.
  • May 28, 2001

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 910 not concurred in.
  • To Senate.
  • May 29, 2001

  • In Senate.
  • Jun 01, 2001

  • Senate Amendment No. 910 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • Jun 02, 2001

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
  • Jun 03, 2001

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 910 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Jun 04, 2001

  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Jun 07, 2001

  • To enrollment.
  • Jun 11, 2001

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Jun 14, 2001

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Jun 15, 2001

  • Chapter 593.

  • Sections 28 to 32, inclusive, and section 36 effective June 14, 2001. Sections 16 and 34 effective June 14, 2001, for purposes related to the adoption and dissemination of regulatioins by the Nevada gaming commission and January 1, 2003, for all other purposes. Sections 1 to 12, inclusive, 14, 15, 17 to 27, inclusive, 33 and 35 effective July 1, 2001. Section 13 effective January 1, 2003.
    Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo