Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB539
Introduced on Mar 26, 2001
By Human Resources and Facilities
Makes various changes concerning fund for a healthy Nevada and program to provide prescription drugs and pharmaceutical services to senior citizens with low incomes under certain circumstances. (BDR 40-536)
Fiscal Note
   Effect On Local Government: No.
   Effect on the State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full bill history below)
Chapter 529.

Hearings
Senate Human Resources and Facilities Apr-13-2001 No Action
Senate Human Resources and Facilities Apr-16-2001 Amend, and do pass as amended
Assembly Health and Human Services May-07-2001 No Action
Assembly Health and Human Services May-21-2001 Amend, and do pass as amended
Senate Human Resources and Facilities May-29-2001 Concur
 
Votes
Senate Final Passage  Apr-27   21 Yea , 0 Nay , 0 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
Assembly Final Passage  May-28   41 Yea , 0 Nay , 1 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
 
Bill Text (PDF) As Introduced     1st Reprint         Second Reprint                 As Enrolled    
Bill Text (HTML) As Introduced     1st Reprint         Second Reprint                 As Enrolled    
Amendments (HTML) Amend. No.536 Amend. No.1110

 Bill History

Mar 26, 2001

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Facilities. To printer.
  • Mar 28, 2001

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Apr 26, 2001

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 536). To printer.
  • Apr 27, 2001

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None). To Assembly.
  • Apr 30, 2001

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
  • May 28, 2001

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1110). To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1). To Senate.
  • May 29, 2001

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1110 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • May 31, 2001

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Jun 05, 2001

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Jun 12, 2001

  • Chapter 529.

  • Sections 11, 13, 14, 16 to 19, inclusive, 21, 22, 23 and 24 effective June 5, 2001. Sections 1 to 10, inclusive, and 12, 15 and 20 effective: (a) Upon proclamation by the Governor pursuant to subsection 2 of section 21 of this act; or (b) On January 1, 2003, if the report filed by the department of human resources pursuant to paragraph (b) of subsection 1 of section 21 indicates either that: (1) There are fewer than 3,500 senior citizens enrolled in and receiving subsidies pursuant to a program established pursuant to NRS 439.635 to 439.690, inclusive; or (2) The annual allocation of money available to the department of human resources for the period from January 1, 2002, to December 31, 2002, to provide subsidies to senior citizens pursuant to NRS 439.635 to 439.690, inclusive, was not sufficient to provide at least 4,700 senior citizens with the subsidized insurance-based coverage and benefits set forth in NRS 439.635 to 439.690, inclusive.
    Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo