Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB195
Introduced on: Mar 10, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley , Oceguera , Leslie , Perkins , Giunchigliani , Allen , Anderson , Angle , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Carpenter , Christensen , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gansert , Gerhardt , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Hettrick , Hogan , Holcomb , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , Marvel , McClain , McCleary , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Pierce , Seale , Sherer , Sibley , Smith , Weber , Wiener , Titus , Carlton , Care , Schneider , Amodei , Coffin , Heck , Horsford , Lee , Nolan , Townsend
Makes various changes concerning purchasing prescription drugs from Canadian pharmacies and regulation of certain pharmacies located outside Nevada. (BDR 54-875)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-16-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-21-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-12-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-01-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do not recede.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 29,   Nay 12,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint                    
Amendments Amend. No.158 Amend. No.926 Amend. No.1094

Bill History

Mar 10, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 158.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 926.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1094.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.

May 28, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 30, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 926 concurred in.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1094 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 1094 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2005

  • From committee: Recede from Senate Amendment No. 1094.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo