Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB416
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McCleary
Revises provisions governing Advisory Board on Automotive Affairs. (BDR 43-1264)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Apr-21-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May-10-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-18   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.731

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 731.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 731 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo