Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB495
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Makes various changes concerning Fund for a Healthy Nevada and provision of prescription drugs and pharmaceutical services by this State. (BDR 40-1031)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-28-2005 11:20 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-15-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-09-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Finance     May-17-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.560 Amend. No.1057

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 560.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 17, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 23, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1057.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 1057 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.
  • Effective July 1, 2005. Section 15 of this act expires by limitation on July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo