Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB524
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Health and Human Services
Makes various changes concerning Fund for a Healthy Nevada and provision of prescription drugs and pharmaceutical services by this State. (BDR 40-169)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 342.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr-04-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr-06-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr-15-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-19-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-23-2005 09:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-31-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.1015

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1015.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

Jun 01, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 342.
  • Effective June 10, 2005. Section 6 of this act expires by limitation on July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo