Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR14
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Health and Human Services
Urges Nevada Congressional Delegation to introduce and to support federal legislation mandating reporting of results of all clinical trials and collection and analysis of data by appropriate federal agencies. (BDR R-1011)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 78.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr-11-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-09-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-19   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-16   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 20, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 10, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 13, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 17, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 78.
  • Effective May 23, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo