Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR6
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley , Oceguera , Leslie , McCleary , Anderson , Allen , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Carpenter , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Giunchigliani , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Hogan , Holcomb , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Perkins , Pierce , Sherer , Sibley , Smith , Titus , Coffin , Care , Schneider , Lee
Urges Congress to amend the Medicare Prescription Drug, Improvement, and Modernization Act of 2003 to provide affordable, easily understood coverage for prescription drug benefits. (BDR R-152)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-01-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Not Heard.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-04-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-18-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-19   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-26   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-26   Yea 10,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 20, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 25, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 26, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.)
  • Action of passage rescinded.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo