Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB2
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy
Prohibits issuance of gift card or gift certificate that contains expiration date. (BDR 52-559)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb-14-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Jan 26, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 01, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo