Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB2
Introduced on: Jan 26, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider
Makes appropriation to State Distributive School Account to ensure that amount of money expended per pupil meets or exceeds national average. (BDR S-60)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Jan 26, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 01, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo