Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB17
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener
Revises provisions governing review of administrative regulations by Legislative Commission. (BDR 18-647)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 498.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb-15-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb-22-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar-17-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun-04-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Feb-28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.4 Amend. No.753 Amend. No.1051 Amend. No.CA43

Bill History

Feb 01, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 02, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Feb 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 4.) To printer.

Feb 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 28, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 01, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Apr 16, 2005

  • Exempt per Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 753.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 27, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1051.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 753 and 1051 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 753 and 1051 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 05, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 753 and 1051 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 15, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.

Jun 16, 2005

  • To enrollment.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 498.
  • Effective June 17, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo