Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB20
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy
Makes various changes relating to governing bodies of certain local governments. (BDR 20682)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 499.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb-21-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-13-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-30-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-19   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 32,   Nay 9,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.903 Amend. No.1093 Amend. No.CA12

Bill History

Feb 01, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 02, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 20, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 903.) To printer.

May 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1093.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 903 and 1093 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 903 and 1093 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 903 and 1093 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 15, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.

Jun 16, 2005

  • To enrollment.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 499.
  • Sections 7 and 8 effective June 17, 2005. Section 1 effective June 17, 2005 for the purpose of appointing the member of the county fair and recreation board pursuant to paragraph (e) of subsection 1 of NRS 244A.603, as amended by this act, and on July 1, 2005, for all other purposes. Sections 2 to 6, inclusive, effective December 1, 2006, if the registered voters of the City of North Las Vegas approve the question submitted pursuant to section 7 of this act at the general election held on November 7, 2006.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo