Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB19
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Hardy
Prohibits, under certain circumstances, issuance of gift certificate that contains expiration date and prohibits, under certain circumstances, issuer of gift certificate from charging certain fees to buyer or holder of gift certificate. (BDR 52-558)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 336.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb-14-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-13-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-27-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Subcommittee.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-16-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.567 Amend. No.858

Bill History

Feb 01, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 02, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 567.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 858.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 858 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 336.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo