Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB28
Introduced on: Feb 03, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske
Prohibits person from knowingly and intentionally capturing image of private area of another person under certain circumstances and prohibits person from knowingly distributing, disclosing, displaying, transmitting or publishing image captured under such circumstances. (BDR 15-8)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb-16-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Mar-10-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-01-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-12-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-09-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-11-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-17-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.284 Amend. No.798

Bill History

Feb 03, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 04, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 284.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 798.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2005

  • Read third time.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Notice of exemption.
  • To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo