Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR11* of the 72nd Session
Introduced on: Feb 03, 2005
By: Elections, Procedures, and Ethics
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to provide for election of certain members and gubernatorial appointment of certain members of Board of Regents, and to specify number and terms of members. (BDR C-18)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 89.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-01-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-15-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-16-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar-23   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-26   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 07, 2005

  • Returned from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 21, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 22, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 23, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.

Mar 24, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 25, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 26, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.

May 27, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 30, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 89.
  • On 2006 ballot.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo