Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB37
Introduced on: Feb 04, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener
Revises provisions governing wholesalers of prescription drugs. (BDR 54-13)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 406.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb-10-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Subcommittee.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb-10-2005 09:10 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-11-2005 10:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-06-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      To Subcommittee.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-17-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-20-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-31-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 18,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.365 Amend. No.878

Bill History

Feb 04, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 365.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 878.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 878 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 406.
  • Sections 1 to 14, inclusive, and 16 to 19, inclusive and 20 effective October 1, 2005. Section 14 expires by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. Section 15 effective on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo