Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB44
Introduced on: Feb 04, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Revises provisions governing payment of overtime to certain employees. (BDR 53-761)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-09-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-08-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-12-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-16-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-01-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do not recede.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.579 Amend. No.859

Bill History

Feb 04, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 05, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 579.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 859.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 859 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 859 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Recede from Senate Amendment No. 859.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 07, 2005

  • To printer.

Jun 15, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo