Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB44
Introduced on: Feb 10, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions regulating organizations for buying goods or services at discount. (BDR 52-763)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb-17-2005 07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb-24-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-20-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-20-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-03   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.15

Bill History

Feb 10, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 11, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 01, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 02, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 15.) To printer.

Mar 03, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Mar 04, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo