Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB48
Introduced on: Feb 10, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Makes various changes relating to collection of debts owed to State. (BDR 31-165)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb-23-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar-02-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-16-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-19-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-07   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 10, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 11, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 03, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 04, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 08, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 25, 2005

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 28, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo