Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB54
Introduced on: Feb 15, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Tiffany
Revises provisions relating to refund provided in certain circumstances upon cancellation of registration of vehicle and surrender of license plates. (BDR 43-859)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar-01-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar-10-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Rerefer.
  Senate Finance     Apr-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 15, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To printer.

Feb 16, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 14, 2005

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo