Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SJR2
Introduced on: Feb 15, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus , Rhoads , Coffin , Wiener , Amodei , Beers , Care , Carlton , Cegavske , Heck , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , Raggio , Schneider , Tiffany , Washington , Buckley , Mortenson , Ohrenschall , Manendo , Giunchigliani , Allen , Anderson , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Carpenter , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Hogan , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Mabey , McClain , McCleary , Munford , Oceguera , Parks , Parnell , Perkins , Pierce , Seale , Sherer , Sibley , Smith
Urges President of United States to reverse his position on, and alternatively urges Congress to reject, his federal budget proposal to use money derived from sales of land in Nevada to lower federal deficit. (BDR R-1087)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 10.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Feb-15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Feb-16   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 15, 2005

  • Read first time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer.

Feb 16, 2005

  • From printer.
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Feb 17, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Feb 22, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 10.
  • Effective February 22, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo