Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB63
Introduced on: Feb 16, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie , Buckley , Giunchigliani , Parks , Anderson , McClain , Oceguera
Prohibits certain practices by health insurers with regard to injuries sustained while under influence of alcohol or controlled substance. (BDR 57-207)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 475.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-02-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-28-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-30-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-22-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-16-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-31-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do not recede.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-15   Yea 37,   Nay 1,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-26   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.169 Amend. No.919

Bill History

Feb 16, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 17, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 169.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 1, Excused: 4.) To Senate.

Apr 18, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 25, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 919.) To printer.

May 26, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 919 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 919 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Recede from Senate Amendment No. 919.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 475.
  • Effective July 1, 2006.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo