Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB65
Introduced on: Feb 16, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Leslie , Parks , Giunchigliani , Conklin , Anderson , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Buckley , Gerhardt , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , McClain , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Perkins , Smith , Titus
Requires State Environmental Commission to adopt regulations prohibiting disposal of electronic waste in landfills and establishing program for recycling of such waste. (BDR 40-489)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar-07-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar-28-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      To Subcommittee.
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar-30-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr-04-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr-05-2005 01:00 PM      Pending.
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr-06-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.282 Amend. No.564

Bill History

Feb 16, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Feb 17, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 282.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 564.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo