Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB66
Introduced on: Feb 16, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin , Giunchigliani , Pierce , Leslie , Parks , Atkinson , Buckley , Claborn , Denis , Gerhardt , Horne , Manendo , Oceguera , Parnell , Perkins , Carlton , Titus
Requires reporting of certain gifts and other economic benefits provided by wholesalers or manufacturers of drugs. (BDR 18-562)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-07-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-06-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-05-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.195

Bill History

Feb 16, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 17, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 195.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 28, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo