Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB68
Introduced on: Feb 16, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Authorizes Department of Taxation to deny licenses or permits to persons liable to Department for payment of money. (BDR 32-390)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb-16-2005 11:40 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-13-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-28-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     May-05-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-18   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-11   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 16, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 17, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 12, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 16, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo