Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB69
Introduced on: Feb 17, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Koivisto , Claborn , McClain , Giunchigliani , Parks , Anderson , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , McCleary , Oceguera , Pierce , Smith
Authorizes labor organization to require employee in bargaining unit who is not member of that labor organization to pay service fee under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-956)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-14-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-30-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-17-2005 07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.489 Amend. No.651

Bill History

Feb 17, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 18, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 489.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 651.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 21, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo