Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB80
Introduced on: Feb 17, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers , Horsford , Cegavske , Tiffany , Hardy , Amodei , Heck , Lee , Townsend , Giunchigliani , Sherer , Hettrick , Buckley , Conklin , Allen , Sibley
Establishes requirements and procedures for consumers to place security freezes in certain files maintained by credit reporting agencies. (BDR 52-284)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb-23-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Subcommittee.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb-23-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-21-2005 10:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-07-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-08-2005 07:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-02-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-04-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-06-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Rescind previous action on: 5-06-05.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-09-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-31-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-19   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.245 Amend. No.722 Amend. No.CA34

Bill History

Feb 17, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 18, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 245.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 20, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 722.) To printer.

May 26, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 722 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 722 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 722 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 06, 2005

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo