Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB87
Introduced on: Feb 18, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Giunchigliani , Perkins , Buckley , Pierce , Arberry Jr. , Anderson , Atkinson , Carpenter , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Goicoechea , Grady , Hogan , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Manendo , Marvel , McClain , McCleary , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Seale , Sherer , Sibley , Smith , Titus , Wiener , Coffin , Carlton , Amodei , Care , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , Schneider
Establishes statutory minimum wage for employees in this State. (BDR 53-1110)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb-23-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-03-2005 07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-02-2005 03:30 PM    Minutes      Do not recede.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Feb-28   Yea 33,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.13 Amend. No.924

Bill History

Feb 18, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 21, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 24, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 13.) To printer.

Feb 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 28, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Mar 01, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 924.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 924 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 924 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: No decision reached.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo