Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB95
Introduced on: Feb 21, 2005
By: Finance
Makes various changes concerning state financial administration. (BDR S1205)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Jun-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-06-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-05   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-06   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.1201

Bill History

Feb 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1201.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 15, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.
  • Subsection 1 of section 3 and section 6 effective June 17, 2005. Subsection 2 of section 3 effective June 17, 2005 and applies retroactively to January 1, 2005. Sections 1, 2 and 4 effective July 1, 2005. Section 5 effective July 1, 2006.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo