Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB96
Introduced on: Feb 21, 2005
By: Ways and Means
Makes appropriations to restore balances in Stale Claims Account, Emergency Account and Reserve for Statutory Contingency Account. (BDR S-1202)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 15.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb-21-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-14-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Finance     Mar-28-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar-17   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 15, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.

Mar 21, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Mar 28, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 30, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 31, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Apr 01, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 06, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 15.
  • Effective April 6, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo