Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB112
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Requires State Controller to apply fee for returned checks to other methods of payment that are returned or dishonored. (BDR 31-164)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar-02-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-25-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-16-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-19-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-07   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-25   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 22, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 23, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 03, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 04, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 08, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Ways and Means. To committees.

May 06, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Government Affairs: Do pass.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

May 23, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Do pass.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 25, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

May 26, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 30, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo