Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB115
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Authorizes governing bodies of local governments and certain advisory bodies to such governing bodies to hold closed meetings concerning matters relating to security and terrorism under certain circumstances. (BDR 19-601)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 24, Excused: 1.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar-31-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-09-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 13,   Nay 7,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 17,   Nay 24,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint                    
Amendments Amend. No.483 Amend. No.821 Amend. No.1052

Bill History

Feb 22, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To printer.

Feb 23, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 483.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 24, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 821.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1052.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 24, Excused: 1.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo