Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB118
Introduced on: Feb 23, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McClain , Hardy , Conklin , Ohrenschall , McCleary , Allen , Anderson , Atkinson , Buckley , Claborn , Denis , Gerhardt , Giunchigliani , Goicoechea , Grady , Hettrick , Hogan , Holcomb , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Manendo , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Parks , Parnell , Perkins , Pierce , Sherer , Sibley , Weber , Heck , Horsford , Schneider , Wiener
Revises provisions governing smoking of tobacco in certain places. (BDR 15-807)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar-17-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar-21-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Judiciary     May-10-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-14   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-16   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 23, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 24, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 15, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 10, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 13, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 17, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo