Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB121
Introduced on: Feb 23, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Heck , Townsend , Carlton , Hardy , Lee , Oceguera , Buckley , Gerhardt , Hardy , Munford , Pierce
Revises provisions governing payment of certain workers' compensation claims. (BDR 53-1021)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-21-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-02-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-05   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.22

Bill History

Feb 23, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 24, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 04, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 22.) To printer.

Mar 08, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 09, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 03, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 04, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 05, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 06, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 09, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo