Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB127
Introduced on: Feb 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus , Hardy
Revises provisions governing applicability of requirements for state business license. (BDR 32-679)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and rerefer.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.437

Bill History

Feb 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 437.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo