Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB129
Introduced on: Feb 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus , Care , Wiener , Coffin , Townsend , Amodei , Beers , Carlton , Cegavske , Heck , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Schneider , Tiffany
Requires Legislator who is public officer or employee to take unpaid leave of absence during regular or special session of Legislature. (BDR 17-28)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar-01-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar-22-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-12   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.206

Bill History

Feb 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 206.) To printer.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 14, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 21, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo