Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB135
Introduced on: Feb 24, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Increases maximum annual amounts that may be assessed against certain insurers for purposes relating to investigation of insurance fraud. (BDR 57-1071)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: None, Nays: 42.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb-25-2005 11:15 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-14-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-23-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-25-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Finance     Apr-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Finance     Apr-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar-17   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-02   Yea 0,   Nay 42,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 15, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate.

Mar 21, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Mar 28, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 30, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 31, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Apr 01, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 07, 2005

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Returned to Assembly.

Apr 28, 2005

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, May 2, 2005, at 11:30 a.m..

May 02, 2005

  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: None, Nays: 42.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo