Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB137
Introduced on: Feb 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , Buckley , Ohrenschall , Parks , Horne , Arberry Jr. , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Giunchigliani , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Manendo , McClain , Munford , Oceguera , Parnell , Pierce , Smith
Revises provisions governing insurance payments in settlement of certain third-party liability claims. (BDR 57-503)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 281.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-07-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-14-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-23-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-25-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-16-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar-17   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 15, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.

Mar 21, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 25, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 27, 2005

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 281.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo