Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB138
Introduced on: Feb 25, 2005
By: Taxation
Limits circumstances in which overpayments of taxes may be applied to underpayments in another reporting period to reduce penalties. (BDR 32-408)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar-10-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-13-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-16   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Feb 25, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 28, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 14, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 15, 2005

  • Read second time.

Mar 16, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 17, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 25, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo