Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB139
Introduced on: Feb 25, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Leslie , Giunchigliani , McCleary , Conklin , Anderson , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Buckley , Claborn , Denis , Gerhardt , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Perkins , Smith
Requires collection and reporting of certain information concerning employers of applicants for Medicaid or Children's Health Insurance Program. (BDR 38-984)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar-30-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-09-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-18   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.139 Amend. No.294

Bill History

Feb 25, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 28, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 139.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 294.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 21, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo