Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR3
Introduced on: Feb 25, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Seale , Giunchigliani , Conklin , Perkins , McCleary , Allen , Anderson , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Buckley , Carpenter , Christensen , Claborn , Denis , Gansert , Gerhardt , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Hettrick , Hogan , Holcomb , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Mabey , Marvel , McClain , Munford , Oceguera , Parks , Parnell , Pierce , Sherer , Sibley , Smith , Weber , Rhoads , Tiffany , Titus
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing certain constitutional officers. (BDR C-947)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-15-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-24-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr-15-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr-26-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-02-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-17-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-05   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.671

Bill History

Feb 25, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Feb 28, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

May 02, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 03, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 671.) To printer.

May 04, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 05, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.

May 06, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo