Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB166
Introduced on: Mar 04, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy , Anderson , Hettrick , Sibley , Parks , Christensen , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gansert , Holcomb , Manendo , McCleary , Seale , Hardy , Nolan , Raggio
Revises certain provisions relating to offers of judgment in civil actions. (BDR 2-564)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar-16-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar-30-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-26-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-28-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-18   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-03   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.140

Bill History

Mar 04, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 07, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 140.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 29, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 03, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 04, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 05, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 09, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo