Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB165
Introduced on: Mar 08, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads
Specifies permissible uses by State Department of Agriculture of certain fees and other money. (BDR 50-1136)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar-23-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar-28-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     Apr-25-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     Apr-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Finance     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-04-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-06-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-06   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.134 Amend. No.1088

Bill History

Mar 08, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 09, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 134.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 08, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

May 31, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1088.) To printer.

Jun 01, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo