Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB167
Introduced on: Mar 08, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton , Titus , Horsford , Perkins , Buckley , Oceguera
Proposes to authorize Legislature to prescribe temporary exemptions from sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-1086)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar-29-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass, and rerefer.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 08, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 09, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 25, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo