Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB185
Introduced on: Mar 09, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert , Hettrick , McCleary , Atkinson , Carpenter , Christensen , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Holcomb , Mabey , Marvel , Sherer , Sibley , Beers
Revises provisions governing petitions for initiative and referendum. (BDR 24-711)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-29-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-14-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-25-2005 11:36 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-10-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-19-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint                    
Amendments Amend. No.471 Amend. No.656 Amend. No.1010

Bill History

Mar 09, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 10, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 471.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 656.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1010.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo