Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB186
Introduced on: Mar 09, 2005
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Authorizes payment of additional compensation for permanent total disability to certain injured employees and their dependents. (BDR S-251)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 350.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-08-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-24-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and rerefer.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-31-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-11-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-20-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-11-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-16-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-26   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.121 Amend. No.565 Amend. No.861

Bill History

Mar 09, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 10, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 28, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 06, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Commerce and Labor.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 121.) Rereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Apr 11, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 565.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 25, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 861.) To printer.

May 26, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 861 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 350.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo