Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB189
Introduced on: Mar 09, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Revises provisions relating to Nevada Equal Rights Commission. (BDR 18-406)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar-21-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-17-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-23-2005 09:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-23-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     Jun-01-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     Jun-05-2005 10:37 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-05   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint                
Amendments Amend. No.454 Amend. No.634 Amend. No.967 Amend. No.1186

Bill History

Mar 09, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 10, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 454.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 634.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Notice of exemption.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 967.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1186.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 1186 not concurred in. To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1186 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 1186 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo